Accounts and annual returns EAST SUSSEX PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE LIMITED

Charity number: 1151348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window