NILE SWIMMERS

Charity number: 1152395
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £17.93k £27.12k £18.53k £7.65k £20.09k
Total expenditure £23.60k £31.59k £3.17k £11.58k £23.22k