INTENTIONAL HEALTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Intentional Health aims to prevent lifestyle disease at the root cause, and improve health & wellbeing. Our unique public health intervention delivered by local church volunteers explores the whole person, including physical, mental, emotional & spiritual health. Our work inspires choice through supportive relationships, and encourages step by step transformational journeys in lifestyle behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 June 2013: CIO registration
- 06 December 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 06 December 2023: Funds transferred to 251549 ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE
- 06 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1133951 HAZEL GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH
- 06 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1127215 THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE...
- INTENTIONAL HEALTH. (Working name)
- EXHALE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.19k | £56.87k | £61.38k | £27.27k | £27.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.28k | £53.96k | £53.65k | £38.77k | £26.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 06 JUN 2013 AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 22 AUG 2016 AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTH AND WELLBEING ACTIVITIES, GRANTS AND SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.