SARAH MOSERET FOOD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities objective is to relief the hardship of individuals by giving them donations towards their daily expenses. Sometimes we buy them food if they find it hard to go shopping themselves due to ill health and physical difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 June 2013: Standard registration
- SARAH OSERET FOOD TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EFRAIM EBERT | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA EBERT | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
YOSEF COHEN | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.00k | £26.60k | £12.22k | £13.60k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.11k | £31.24k | £15.46k | £14.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 THE DRIVE
LONDON
NW11 9UJ
- Phone:
- 07817237053
- Email:
- thebookkeeper1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window