TAUNTON OSNA CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In this financial year we have raised suficient funds to purchase an OSNA machine. This means that axillary surgery for lymph nodes involved with cancer can be done at the same time as the breast surgery and so a second operation isn't required. The committee has been responsible for arranging 3 major events - a balloon race, a race night and a night with an illusionist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 July 2013: Standard registration
- 21 June 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2015 | 01/01/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.21k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £8 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2016 | 18 January 2017 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2015 | 19 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2015 | 19 June 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PURCHASING EQUIPMENT THAT CAN NOT BE PROVIDED BY THE NHS FOR MUSGROVE PARK HOSPITAL BREAST CARE CENTRE.
Area of benefit
MUSGROVE PARK, TAUNTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window