THE AUBREY ORCHARD-LISLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to support West Buckland School and such other charities in the Education and Health sectors as the Trustees agree. The provision of financial support for well-motivated young people who need help to complete their studies is given priority. Charities seeking more general support are required to demonstrate the direct measurable gain that any grant might make.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2013: Standard registration
- THE CHELSEA SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert David Hunter | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jolyon Orchard-Lisle | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN LAXTON | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||
ANDREW EDWARD GUY GULLIFORD | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN EASBY | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.64k | £79.38k | £94.41k | £102.56k | £104.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.38k | £185.00k | £83.98k | £94.03k | £91.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2013
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HOLD THE TRUST FUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SPECIFIED CHARITIES BELOW, AND FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS. GUY'S HOSPTIAL ENDOWMENT FUND WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND WEST BUCKLAND OLD BOY'S ACCOCIATION FRIENDS OF WEST BUCKLAND SCHOOL THE ORCHARD-LISLE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haysmacintyre
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
LONDON
EC4R 1AG
- Phone:
- 020 7969 5500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window