Trustees THE SCREWFIX FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth Comber Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Lyndsey Taylor Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Philip Barr Trustee 10 June 2022
None on record
Kelvin Jackson Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Nicholas Boyd Trustee 10 June 2021
None on record
Caroline Jane Welsh Trustee 25 February 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Bell Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
JONATHAN MARK MEWETT Trustee 06 March 2013
None on record