Trustees EASTER ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1153970

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
QUENTIN COUPLAND MAXWELL-JACKSON | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Austin | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thomas Regan | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Davies | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Best | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Calum Kennedy | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR GREGORY PLACE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dyson | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.