BLACKBURN VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1150962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 March 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 04 February 2017 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required