BLACKBURN VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1150962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £10.16k £9.37k £11.60k £8.97k £22.22k
Total expenditure £9.98k £9.74k £11.03k £9.70k £19.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A