Financial history THE SHEBA PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1151496
Charity reporting is overdue by 410 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £27.20k £30.24k £16.04k £14.93k £38.01k
Total expenditure £28.16k £22.21k £16.24k £20.53k £43.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £930 N/A N/A N/A