FRIENDS OF ST FLORENCE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1151429
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raffles, Disco's, Xmas Fayre, Sports Day, St David's Day, Summer BBQ,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £12,459
Total expenditure: £11,291

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOSS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caitlin Lucy Rees Chair 29 September 2021
None on record
Rachael Ceris Brace Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/10/2019 05/10/2020 05/10/2021 05/10/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.31k £1.44k £1.15k £9.07k £12.46k
Total expenditure £3.28k £3.20k £147 £4.48k £11.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 February 2025 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2022 12 February 2025 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2021 14 September 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2019 30 September 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Florence School
St. Florence
TENBY
Dyfed
SA70 8LY
Phone:
01834871325
Email:
No information available