AL HAKIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154526
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.78k £17.56k £24.56k £31.52k £23.50k
Total expenditure £8.90k £16.40k £23.62k £29.69k £21.48k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A