ST MARGARET'S VILLAGE HALL (KENT)

Charity number: 1151534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 September 2020 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required