Accounts and annual returns NORTH TAMESIDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL TL/239I

Charity number: 503573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required