MANOR ROAD PARENT, TEACHER & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Running discos for the school children, running the School fayres at Christmas and Summer and holding a Mother's Day and Father's Day shop to generate funds for specific school requests

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £12,493
Total expenditure: £12,165

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MANOR ROAD PTFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lyndsay Steele Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
REBECCA CLARE TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £729 £5.36k £5.20k £8.57k £12.49k
Total expenditure £2.12k £9.33k £1.38k £8.01k £12.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
400 Scar Lane
Golcar
Huddersfield
HD7 4AR
Phone:
07739858586
Website:

No information available