THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL TEAM PARISH OF MIRFIELD

Charity number: 1151061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £233.33k £473.56k £373.37k £198.01k £145.75k
Total expenditure £228.52k £175.64k £230.20k £202.36k £143.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A