THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL TEAM PARISH OF MIRFIELD

Charity number: 1151061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

An ecclesiastical parish within the Church of England. Pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical activities. Maintenance responsibilities for the Parish Churches of St Mary, Mirfield, St Paul, Eastthorpe and St John, Upper Hopton . Maintenance of Church House building and Parish Hall in Church Lane , Mirfield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £222,886
Total expenditure: £274,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • MIRFIELD TEAM PARISH (WORKING NAME) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev HUGH CRISPIN BAKER Chair 28 February 2013
None on record
RUTH MARGARET KING Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
RACHEL MARGARET COPLEY Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Katharine Margaret Crossley Trustee 28 April 2024
LEEDS ANGLICAN CURSILLO (ALSO KNOWN AS WEST YORKSHIRE AND THE DALE ANGLICAN CURSILLO)
Received: On time
HELEN FRANCES WALKER Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
SUSAN AUCKLAND Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN GRACE Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BARKER Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
SUSAN PATRICIA WHEATLEY YOUNG Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Rev HELEN CAROLE BUTLER Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
ANNE LESLEY HEELEY Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
RUTH ANNE EDWARDS Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
STEPHEN RICHARD BUTLER Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
DAVID MELLOR BROOKE Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
LAUREN MONTGOMERY-BELL Trustee 28 February 2013
8TH MIRFIELD (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP
Received: 28 days late
CHRIS BREARE Trustee 28 February 2013
CROFT HOUSE ROOMS (KNOWN LOCALLY AS UPPER HOPTON VILLAGE HALL)
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF UPPER HOPTON PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
UPPER HOPTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BARRY HAMBLING Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £198.01k £145.75k £176.44k £174.37k £222.89k
Total expenditure £202.36k £143.75k £153.53k £177.64k £274.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 Church Lane
MIRFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF14 9HX
Phone:
01924490167