Financial history CITY TEMPLE URC

Charity number: 1151257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £460.19k £308.91k £235.63k £240.64k £326.19k
Total expenditure £383.04k £298.53k £320.99k £261.88k £225.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A