FRIENDS OF ST ALKMUND'S WHITCHURCH

Charity number: 1151968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAY HATTON Trustee 26 February 2013
WHITCHURCH (SHROPSHIRE) EDGELEY PARK TRUST Received: On time
SIMON JAMES EDGE Trustee 15 June 2018 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SMITH Trustee 15 June 2018
HIGHER WYCH SCHOOL CHARITY Received: On time
ELIZABETH LANGFORD'S ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY Received: On time
SAMUEL HIGGINSON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY Received: On time
Hilda Francis-Smith Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
RAYMOND FRANCIS HATTON Trustee 07 March 2013
SIR JOHN TALBOT'S SCHOOL CHARITY Received: On time
THE WHITCHURCH WATERWAY TRUST Received: On time
THOMAS GORDON RYLANDS Trustee 07 March 2013 None on record
NICOLA JOY YOUNG Trustee 15 June 2018 None on record
Rev JUDITH MARY HUNT Trustee 07 March 2013
BRIDGEWATER LIBRARY FUND Received: On time
SIR JOHN TALBOT'S SCHOOL CHARITY Received: On time
MARY WHETTON (OR WITTON) CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITIES OF MISS HANNAH LEE Received: On time
WHITCHURCH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
EARL OF BRIDGEWATER'S CHARITY Received: On time
BELINDA HUTCHINSON-SMITH Trustee 07 March 2013 None on record
Alexandra Dilys Williamson Trustee 12 June 2015 None on record