NORTHAMPTON ABINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £49.22k £48.50k £52.58k £58.25k £59.85k
Total expenditure £40.34k £48.44k £61.78k £70.14k £76.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.70k £0 N/A N/A £515