HARINGEY MIGRANT SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1152227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Charles Trustee 14 June 2014 None on record
Kristina Glenn Trustee 10 December 2020
RIGHTS OF WOMEN INCORPORATED
Grace Brown Trustee 20 February 2020
THE VOICE OF DOMESTIC WORKERS Received: On time
VIOLETA MICHAELA BUTCOVAN Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record
Navjyot Kaur Johal Trustee 14 January 2021 None on record
Alec James Turner Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
Isabella D'Emilio Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Lisa Crivello Trustee 07 June 2021
WE ARE STRONGER CHARITY Received: On time
David Michael Rayns Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
CLAUDIA CLAROS-SAAVEDRA Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record