WAKEFIELD THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 503597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darren Johnson Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record
PAT LANGHAM Trustee 31 January 2013 None on record
Jacquie Speight Trustee 12 August 2015 None on record
Lindsey Rachel Davies Trustee 26 February 2014 None on record
Brandon Paul Robinson-Connolly Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record
Garry Fairfax Lyons Trustee 20 May 2019
QUEENS HALL ARTS Received: On time
Katherine Louise Town Trustee 04 September 2018 None on record
Olivia Maria Rowley Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record
Daniel John McCormack Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record
Peter Box CBE Trustee 30 June 2018
WELCOME TO YORKSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
AGE UK WAKEFIELD DISTRICT Received: On time
SPECTRUM PEOPLE Received: On time
Gill Galdins Chair 26 February 2014
RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL Received: On time
Nigel Gordon Brook Trustee 19 January 2021
WAKEFIELD DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX Received: On time
KATHRYN MORGAN Trustee 06 December 2016 None on record
Tim Welton Trustee 14 May 2014
WILSON'S GIFT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VICAR OF WAKEFIELD Received: On time
THE BROTHERTON SCIENCE SCHOLARSHIP Received: On time
BISHOP ASHTON ESSAY PRIZE ICW WAKEFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL Received: On time