SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1151834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 06 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download