SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1151834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Rose Lee Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record
Eilish Calnan Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record
Dr LOVEDAY ELIZABETH TREVENEN JENKIN Trustee 03 April 2013
KESKERDH KERNOW LIMITED Received: On time
Victoria Ruth Wiltshire Trustee 28 February 2017 None on record
Susan Elizabeth Freeman Trustee 26 February 2019 None on record
FELICITY NICOLA BOASE Trustee 03 April 2013
HELSTON DOWNSLAND CHARITY Received: 9 days late
TREVENEN EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT Received: On time
THE HELSTON WELFARE TRUST Received: On time
DAVID JOHN TURNBULL Trustee 03 April 2013 None on record
Phillip Woods Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
JUDITH ANNE HAYCOCK Chair 03 April 2013 None on record
REGINALD JOHN BOASE Trustee 03 April 2013
HELSTON & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Received: On time
HELSTON DOWNSLAND CHARITY Received: 9 days late