MILTON KEYNES ANANDA CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity?s objects are the advancement of the Hindu religion and Hindu culture and heritage for the public benefit in particular but not exclusively through the holding of prayer meetings and organising cultural functions and Hindu religious festivals (including festivals such as Durga Puja, Laxmi Puja and Kali Puja).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Subir Chatterjee | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarbendu Mandal | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sreeparna Garewal | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bishwadip Roy | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.13k | £13.59k | £13.19k | £29.43k | £45.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.30k | £4.12k | £16.84k | £24.68k | £29.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS (?THE OBJECTS?) ARE: (1) TO ENCOURAGE ASIAN ART AND CULTURE AND ORGANISE SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WHOLE MEMBERSHIP AND THE WIDER LOCAL COMMUNITY AND FOSTER RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER COMMUNITIES (2) TO ORGANISE THE HINDU DURGA PUJA FESTIVAL (FOLLOWED BY THE HINDU LAKSMI PUJA) AS AN ANNUAL EVENT, AS WELL AS OTHER HINDU FESTIVALS WHERE SUPPORTED BY THE MAJORITY OF THE MEMBERSHIP (3) TO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITABLE CAUSES AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS , PROVIDING INTERESTS AND COMMITMENTS ARE SHOWN BY THE MAJORITY OF THE MEMBERSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 Newport Road
Brooklands
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 7EQ
- Phone:
- 07966000278
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window