Financial history AID FOR TRADE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153418
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £830 £3.62k £4.30k £8.35k £6.66k
Total expenditure £2.31k £4.80k £4.46k £7.95k £4.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A