ST. OSWALD'S COMMUNICARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1153272
Charity reporting is up to date (137 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required