ST. OSWALD'S COMMUNICARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1153272
Charity reporting is up to date (137 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.57k £9.40k £15.94k £19.46k £15.93k
Total expenditure £5.21k £7.59k £6.95k £13.32k £19.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £1.20k N/A