Accounts and annual returns HIGHFIELD MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 503619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 March 2022 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required