LEICESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1151692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £245.30k £388.17k £390.08k £420.62k £475.41k
Total expenditure £405.21k £327.47k £417.92k £403.97k £396.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A