LEICESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1151692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Reddecliffe Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Steve E Roddy Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
Rev Andrew Hall Trustee 01 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURBAGE WITH ASTON FLAMVILLE Received: On time
Emma Prokipczuk Trustee 17 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HINCKLEY Received: On time
Neil Bardsley Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record
Rev Elizabeth Wilson Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
THE VENERABLE Claire Wood Trustee 08 October 2017
THE GODFREY FUND FOR RETIRED CLERGY Overdue by 904 days
THE LEICESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Claire Bampton Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
Rev Rosie Woodhall Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record
Stephen Adshead Chair 31 May 2016 None on record
THE VENERABLE Richard Worsfold Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
GWYNNE JONES Trustee 19 March 2013
STANLEY BURROUGH'S ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
Jonathan Kerry Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
Rt Revd Martyn James Snow Trustee 14 May 2016
LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
ADELE LEADBEATER Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record
Dr Codra Theresa Spencer Trustee 01 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL LOUGHBOROUGH Received: On time
RUSSELL ANDREWS Trustee 19 April 2013 None on record
Rev David Cowie Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH CLARE WAYNE-HAWKER Trustee 19 April 2013 None on record
REVEREND CANON Emma Davies Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
Mandy Green Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Rev Julia Hargreaves Trustee 01 January 2019
THOMAS LEAVING Received: On time
Rev Philip Watson Trustee 31 May 2016
ALDERMAN NEWTON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
POOR'S PLATT Received: On time
REVEREND CANON PHILIP JONATHAN O'REILLY Trustee 19 April 2013
THE FRIENDS OF FLECKNEY LIBRARY Received: On time
ALDERMAN NEWTON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time