SAIL (SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST LINE)

Charity number: 1152263
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 July 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 July 2020 167 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 December 2016 On time Download