SAIL (SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST LINE)

Charity number: 1152263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.62k £87.93k £191.74k £222.89k £323.00k
Total expenditure £62.26k £85.63k £147.01k £203.92k £232.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £25.87k N/A £207.27k £93.02k