SAIL (SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST LINE)

Charity number: 1152263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Thornton-Delve Trustee 18 January 2016 None on record
Lewis Hanney Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record
Gabrielle Binnie Trustee 14 December 2016 None on record
Michelle Grant Chair 18 November 2014 None on record
Anna Gaunt Trustee 20 August 2021 None on record
Suzanne Carden Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record