WARRINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £26.63k £17.52k £26.98k £45.12k £124.45k
Total expenditure £21.92k £24.88k £26.92k £38.43k £47.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £4.58k