Financial history Torus Foundation

Charity number: 1152903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.64m £2.47m £2.83m £4.19m £3.42m
Total expenditure £856.00k £2.09m £2.88m £4.08m £4.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.00k £0 £261.00k £6.00k £36.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £2.00m £2.00m £2.01m £1.98m
Income - Other trading activities £44.00k £67.00k £62.00k £64.00k £50.00k
Income - Charitable activities £328.00k £391.00k £737.00k £2.09m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £3.00k £10.00k £11.00k £0
Income - Other £3.00k £6.00k £22.00k £24.00k £167.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £853.00k £2.09m £2.88m £4.08m £4.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £15.00k £15.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0