EYE FOR AN EYE CATARACT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cataract surgical services to marginalised areas where access to such facilities is restricted and on their commitment to help local partners develop high quality, affordable eye care services that communities can sustain on their own. Partner with organisations who can deliver cataract surgery to those in need in a cost-effective way and delivering a full procedure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 09 September 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID LISTER ALLAMBY FRCS | Chair | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH ELIZABETH WINGATE | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NGHI TRAN | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 408 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CATARACT IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PREVENTABLE LOSS OF VISION FROM CATARACTS
Area of benefit
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 WIMPOLE STREET
LONDON
W1G 8GQ
- Phone:
- 02073078250
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window