ST CEDD'S C OF E (VA) PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1151891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 March 2020 11 January 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 09 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required