ST CEDD'S C OF E (VA) PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1151891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 10/03/2017 10/03/2018 09/03/2019 09/03/2020
Total gross income £8.45k £11.92k £14.89k £5.97k £4.16k
Total expenditure £6.12k £5.54k £14.92k £5.43k £2.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.00k £6.00k N/A N/A