CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOUTH TYNESIDE

Charity number: 1153612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 April 2017 On time Download