THE COLIN MCMILLAN BOXING TRAINING ACADEMY

Charity number: 1151956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 July 2019 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 April 2017 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required