TOGETHER LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1151977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £89.89k £77.16k £65.85k £39.93k £40.78k
Total expenditure £83.70k £87.34k £81.24k £41.78k £16.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A