LORETO EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1160672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SISTER KATHRYN MARY KEIGHER Trustee 07 July 2012
INSTITUTE OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY COMMONLY CALLED THE SISTERS OF LORETO Received: On time
Victoria Dolan Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Dr Justin Peter McCarthy Trustee 07 July 2012 None on record
Ursula Mary Morrissey Trustee 14 March 2019
THE DYMPNA CENTRE Received: On time
THE GABRIEL FUND Received: 44 days late
THE ARCHANGEL TRUST Received: 44 days late
Jane Maureen Mee Trustee 07 July 2012 None on record
SISTER ELLEN MARGARET MARY O'NEILL Trustee 07 July 2012 None on record
Mary Cecilia Lynch Trustee 07 July 2012 None on record
Ann Clynch Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
SISTER CECILIA TURTLE Trustee 15 March 2012
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF OUR LADY MOTHER OF MERCY Received: On time
Sister Patricia Mary Goodstadt Chair 07 July 2012 None on record
Kathleen Walsh Trustee 07 July 2012 None on record
Sister Gemma Simmonds CJ Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Peter Joseph McGhee Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record