CANTERBURY UMBRELLA

Charity number: 1153745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £130.54k £116.19k £121.77k £103.45k £134.01k
Total expenditure £160.25k £124.46k £141.71k £143.25k £171.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A