THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST LUKE THE EVANGELIST, CLAY HILL, ENFIELD

Charity number: 1151418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides public worship open to all and sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work includes visiting sick & bereaved. Teaches Christianity through sermons, courses & groups. Takes religious assemblies in church school. Promotes Christianity through events & meetings and the Church?s mission through activities for people of all ages. Supports other UK & overseas charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £103,376
Total expenditure: £116,295

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF ST JOHN & ST LUKE, CLAYHILL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mitzi James Chair 11 June 2023
None on record
JOAN VERA YOUNG Trustee 05 March 2023
BRIDGE OF HOPE CHILDRENS MINISTRY
Received: On time
Anne Marie Tucker Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record
Rev Jeremy Michael Foot Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Doreen Addy Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Heather Muriel Ogilvy Livermore Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Jack Williams Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Marion Margaret Berry Trustee 06 March 2016
None on record
PETER LIVERMORE Trustee 15 March 2015
ALL PEOPLE ALL PLACES
Received: On time
Dr JOHN SIDNEY WRIGHT Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
PAUL BATES Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
ELAINE ANN PLUMB Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
CHERYL GRAHAM Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
MARY LESLEY ENGLEFIELD Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
IAN JAMES BUSWELL Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record
MICHAEL ANTHONY MANSFIELD Trustee 24 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £139.45k £136.14k £111.74k £98.42k £103.38k
Total expenditure £162.63k £145.04k £97.45k £107.88k £116.30k
Income from government contracts £764 N/A £1.99k £728 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
92 Browning Road
Enfield
EN2 0HG
Phone:
020836366055