Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATED STUDIOS

Charity number: 1152203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 September 2020 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 September 2020 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window