Accounts and annual returns GWYNFI MINERS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1154423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window