Financial history GWYNFI MINERS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1154423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £54.88k £62.23k £55.00k £61.51k £131.59k
Total expenditure £62.00k £72.72k £64.53k £73.53k £77.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.00k N/A £18.60k £43.80k