CROWTHORNE OLD AGE TO TEEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152306
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 19 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 24 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 27 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)